HI HB567 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB567
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Kong, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Kong, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons who manufacture, sell, offer for sale, lease, or distribute a product that makes content accessible on the Internet to include digital blocking capability that renders human trafficking hubs, child pornography, revenge pornography, and pornographic material inaccessible. Requires these persons to establish and maintain a reporting system for content that is improperly blocked and applicable content that is not blocked. Allows consumers to disable the blocking capability if the consumer fulfils requirements, including paying a fee for deposit in the human trafficking victim services fund. Establishes the misdemeanor offense of intentionally failing to include digital blocking capability. Establishes the human trafficking and child exploitation prevention special fund to provide grants for various purposes. Effective 7/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Digital Content Blockers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Kong, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB567 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Kong, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Gates, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
SB254 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/JDC, WAM.
SB254 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=567&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB567_.HTM |