HI SB2533 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of land and natural resources management to co-enforce, with the United States Coast Guard, rules, standards, and requirements related to ballast-water, vessel biofouling, vessel hull in-water cleaning, and any other incidental discharges that may pose a risk for the introduction and spread of non-native aquatic organisms. Appropriates funds for staffing and operating expenditures for aquatic biosecurity.
Title
Relating To Aquatic Biosecurity.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2533&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2533_.HTM |