HI SB253 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, among other things, independent medical examinations and permanent impairment rating examinations for workers' compensation claims to be performed by physicians mutually agreed upon by employers and employees or appointed by the director of labor and industrial relations. Allows for the use of an out-of-state physician under certain conditions. Appropriates funds for positions to assist with workers' compensation claims. Effective January 1, 2018. Repeals on June 30, 2023.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=253&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB253_.HTM |