HI SB249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:45PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:45PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the percentage of average final compensation used to calculate the retirement allowance for a member who first earned credited service as a judge after June 30, 2050, to two per cent. (SB249 HD1)
Title
Relating To Retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:45PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:30PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Kim. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Yamashita. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 583). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (12) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1762), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Gates, Holt, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Tokioka; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Tupola, Ward; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kobayashi, LoPresti, Oshiro, Souki, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Say voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1356) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Matsumoto; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 106) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, K. Rhoads. Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, L. Thielen). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-17 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB249 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:45PM in conference room 309.
HB987 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
HB987 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4