HI SB2486 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of education to establish a standardized data collection process; collect and analyze data relating to, among other things, student discipline, seclusion, and restraint, school climate, and student achievement; and annually report certain information to the board of education, legislature, and the public. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education Data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-07-10HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632).
2020-07-10SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2020-07-08SenateOne Day Notice 07-10-20.
2020-07-08SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 400).
2020-07-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-07-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.
2020-07-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1274-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-06-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
2020-06-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-06-25HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
2020-06-25HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-06-23HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-06-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 06-23-20 1:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 255) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3162) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-06SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
2020-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to EDU, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2093 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback