HI SB2476 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires arbitration awards, records of awards, and relating supporting materials under chapter 466K, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to be public records. Requires arbitrators who are named or appointed in a submission agreement to appraise or arbitrate entered into after July 1, 2014 to record with the bureau of conveyances all arbitration awards; records of awards, if separately issued; and any supplementary, dissenting, or explanatory opinions on awards within ninety days of the notification of the determination of the award to the parties. Specifies that no agreement between the parties or the appraisers acting as arbitrators may preclude or deny the recordation of the award, the record of the award, or any supplementary, dissenting, or explanatory opinions. Clarifies that failure to comply is a violation of real estate appraiser license or certification requirements. (SD1)
Title
Real Estate Appraisers; Arbitration Awards; Recordation; Non-confidentiality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-03-07 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-07-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2014-02-28 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 41) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-14. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |