HI SB2470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Executive Office on Aging of the Department of Health for the Hawaii Healthy Aging Partnership. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawai'i Health Aging Partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2582) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1771 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DOH
Executive Office on Aging
Expenditure Ceiling
Hawaii Healthy Aging Partnership
Kupuna Caucus
DOH
Executive Office on Aging
Expenditure Ceiling
Hawaii Healthy Aging Partnership
Kupuna Caucus