HI SB2458 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to require climate vulnerability assessments for permit applications for projects involving building, transportation, or land use change that may generate significant greenhouse gas emissions. Applies to permit applications filed after 12/31/2019.
Title
Relating To Climate Change.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2458&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2458_.HTM |