HI SB2424 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the written consent of family court for a marriage when one of the parties to the marriage is a minor at the time of contracting the marriage and the other party is more than five years older than the minor. Requires the department of health to inform the child protective services unit of the department of human services for investigation of all parties, including the prospective spouse and any person giving written consent to a minor's marriage, when one of the parties to a marriage is a minor and the other party is more than five years older than the minor. Requires the child protective services unit to provide a written report of its findings to the family court no more than two weeks from the date of the application to marry. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Marriage Of Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-18 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 03-18-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2946) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-22 10:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2467) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |