HI SB2402 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code related to at-risk rules and deductions and to passive activity loss do not apply with respect to claims for the state low-income housing tax credit after December 31, 2018. (SB2402 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Low-income Housing Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, Nakamura, McDermott. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1986-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, San Buenaventura. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-13-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2889) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2056) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2472 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.