HI SB2365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes, beginning January 1, 2021, labeling requirements for any food or raw agricultural commodity sold in the State that contains a genetically engineered material, or was produced with a genetically engineered material; establishes exceptions; establishes violations; and requires director of health to adopt rules.
Title
Relating To Food Labeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2365&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2365_.HTM |