HI SB2330 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 085, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 085, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends membership and leadership of the Kaneohe Bay Regional Council. Requires the Council to hold quarterly meetings on the status of the master plan. Requires the council to review and report on the continued relevance and need for changes in its powers, duties, and functions. (CD1)
Title
Kaneohe Bay Regional Council; Membership; Functions; Report
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 085, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 085, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1186). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 20-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 20-14). |
2014-04-17 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami, Ito, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 8:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Solomon Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hanohano, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Ito, Say, Fale Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-10-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Deferred until 04-04-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 421). |
2014-04-02 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Hashem, Wooley excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-03-31 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-02-14. |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-21-14 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka excused (2). |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-12-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to OMH, WAL, referral sheet 29 |
2014-02-28 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-14. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2467) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ihara, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Referred to WTL.