HI SB2329 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires proof of compliance with ignition interlock laws to be eligible for a driver's license. Requires any person operating a vehicle with an ignition interlock to have valid government-issued photo identification in their immediate possession. Amends the sentencing requirements for certain offenses involving driving during a suspension or revocation period and circumventing or tampering with ignition interlock devices. Prohibits a person who is restricted to driving a vehicle equipped with an ignition interlock device from knowingly obscuring a camera lens associated with the device. Effective 7/1/2021. (HD3)
Title
Relating To Ignition Interlock Devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 396). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265-20) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-06-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Thielen. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 06-24-20 3:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3109) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2757) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |