HI SB232 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires procurement officers, when assessing an offeror's responsibility, to require the offeror to submit answers to questions contained in a standard questionnaire. Establishes certain questions that must be included in the questionnaire. Requires offerors to submit the questionnaire on an annual basis to be prequalified as responsible for projects by the procurement office. Provides that the information furnished in response to the questionnaire shall be available for public inspection and duplication.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Procurement Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-02-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB113 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB232 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
SB232 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=232&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB232_.HTM |