HI SB2284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an interdepartmental research task force to assist the council on revenues in preparing revenue forecasts for state government. Makes an appropriation to department of taxation to prepare tax data for use in the development of various economic models. Makes an appropriation to the department of business, economic development, and tourism to assist the council on revenues with the development of various economic models.
Title
Council on Revenues; Interdepartmental Research Task Force; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-05-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1924 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2284&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2284_.HTM |