HI HB1924 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Interdepartmental Research Task Force to assist the Council on Revenues in developing economic models for revenue forecasts for state government. Makes an appropriation to Department of Taxation to prepare tax data for use in economic model development and to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to assist the Council on Revenues with the development of various economic models. Effective January 20, 2050. (HB1924 HD1)
Title
Council on Revenues; Interdepartmental Research Task Force; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 149). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 721-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4). |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-04 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Ito, Ohno. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-04-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2284 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.