HI SB2277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an income tax credit on sales of principal residences that are less than the home's original purchase price, limited by the taxpayer's income, up to an annual statewide cap of $2,000,000. Allows for a taxpayer to elect to take a discounted amount as a cash refund.
Title
Relating To Real Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2277&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2277_.HTM |