HI SB2275 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements and permitting procedures for transportation network companies and transportation network drivers. Makes permanent the motor vehicle insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network company drivers. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Transportation Network Companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2806) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2545) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPN. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1596 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to TRS, CPN/WAM.