HI SB2265 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the micro enterprise assistance program on Hawaiian home lands revolving fund to provide grants and loans through the implementation by the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands of the micro enterprise assistance program to qualified native Hawaiians, native Hawaiian-controlled homestead associations, homestead association community development corporations, and Native Hawaiian community organizations with a demonstrated ability and history of making and administering loans and providing support to qualified native Hawaiians. Authorizes the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to enter into a memorandum of agreement with the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to implement the program. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Homelands.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2020-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 22) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-18-20. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2892) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-20 10:40AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |