HI SB2244 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 155, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 155, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care providers in the workers' compensation system who are authorized to prescribe opioids to adopt and maintain policies for informed consent to opioid therapy in circumstances that carry elevated risk of dependency. Establishes limits for concurrent opioid and benzodiazepine prescriptions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 155, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 155, on 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 95-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 95-18). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Takumi, Luke, Ichiyama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Baker, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Mizuno, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to LAB/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-18. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1759-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, Mizuno, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka. |
2018-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/HHS on Thursday, 03-22-18 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB/HHS, CPC, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 43) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-02-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2578) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2299) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |