HI SB2165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to inventory historic properties and burial sites in the State, collect data on burial site locations, and conduct an archaeological surface survey. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2326) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, McKelvey. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Burial Sites
DLNR
Expenditure Ceiling
Historic Properties
Inventory
State Historic Preservation Division
Burial Sites
DLNR
Expenditure Ceiling
Historic Properties
Inventory
State Historic Preservation Division