HI SB2138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that each vote cast for a question on a ballot for the ratification of a constitutional amendment be counted in the negative only if the ballot properly indicates that the vote is in the negative.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1605 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2138&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2138_.HTM |