HI SB2138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects interns who work for the State to the state ethics code by defining and including the term "intern" in the definition of employees, who are subject to the provisions of the code. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To State Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to GVR, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 51) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2775) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |