HI SB2124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county liquor commissions and liquor control adjudication boards to revoke or suspend; deny the application, renewal, or transfer of; or withhold issuance of a liquor license when the licensee or applicant fails to take corrective action to address noise complaints or violations. Sets maximum permissible noise levels in dBC measurements for noise emitted by establishments licensed to sell liquor and clarifies that emission of noise that exceeds the maximum permissible noise level constitutes a noise violation. Authorizes law enforcement officers to enforce noise violations by issuing summons or citations. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Noise Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 04-04-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1372-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | House | Re-referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 28 |
2022-03-11 | House | Re-referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 25 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2849) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, San Buenaventura. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HTH, CPN/JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1854 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 2
Subjects
County Liquor Commissions
County Liquor Control Adjudication Boards
Department of Health
Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Liquor License
Maximum Permissible Sound Level
Noise Control
County Liquor Control Adjudication Boards
Department of Health
Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Liquor License
Maximum Permissible Sound Level
Noise Control