HI SB2038 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the increased access to responsible small dollar loans pilot program, within the department of commerce and consumer affairs division of financial institutions, to increase the availability of responsible small dollar investment loans of at least $300 but less than $2,500. Specifies requirements of the program, including application requirements, interest rates, use of finders, and fees. Requires a preliminary report to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2018 and a final report no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2021. Pilot program repeals June 30, 2021.
Title
Increased Access to Responsible Small Dollar Loans Pilot Program; Division of Financial Institutions; Financial Institutions; Finders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2547 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2038&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2038_.HTM |