HI SB2022 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a timeframe for the decision-making processes of the Public Utilities Commission. Requires the Commission to establish criteria for prioritizing among multiple proceedings. Requires the Commission to submit a report to the Legislature prior to each regular session on all proceedings that were open at any time during the preceding year.
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2022&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2022_.HTM |