HI SB195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the Hawaiian version of a law be held binding if the law in question was originally drafted in Hawaiian and then translated into English. Requires that okina and kahako be used, when appropriate, in documents prepared by or for state or county agencies or officials.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian As An Official Language Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB195 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
HB780 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB780 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=195&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB195_.HTM |