HI SB15 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to examine changing the 10 percent ethanol requirement for gasoline to a locally-produced biofuels and biodiesel requirement. Establishes Biofuels Production Income Tax Credit. Repeals Ethanol Facility Tax Credit. (SB15 HD2)
Title
Biofuel; Ethanol; Motor Vehicles; Diesel Fuel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 11:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami, Luke Co-Chairs; Lowen, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1181) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 20. |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 50) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |