HI SB144 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the threshold value in controversy requirement for jury trials in civil cases at common law from $5,000 to $10,000. (SB144 HD1)
Title
Suits at Common Law; Jury Trials; Value in Controversy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:02PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Ihara, Kouchi, Shimabukuro. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 485). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Matsumoto, Pouha, Tupola voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 70) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-15 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |