HI SB1438 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Office of Consumer Protection from the Department of Commerce and Consumer Protection to the Department of the Attorney General. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, CPN/JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to GVO, CPN/JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1438 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Department of Commerce and Consumer Protection
Department of the Attorney General
Office of Consumer Protection
Transfer
Department of the Attorney General
Office of Consumer Protection
Transfer