HI SB1374 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employer to remit the amount of an employee's union dues to a personal representative selected by the employee in the event the employee's union decides not to represent the employee's position in a grievance.
Title
Collective Bargaining; Union Dues
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1374&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1374_.HTM |