HI SB1347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public schools, upon appropriate approval, to use school resources to distribute to students and their families third party promotional materials that contain information about a community event or are produced by or offer services from a nonprofit organization if the material meets specified criteria.
Title
Department of Education; Nonprofit Organizations; Community Events; Promotional Materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1398 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1347&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1347_.HTM |