HI SB1298 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys in fiscal year 2016-2017 to the office of elections, senate, and house of representatives for duties needed to be undertaken to enable registered voters to vote at the 2016 general election on state constitutional amendments proposed by the legislature during the 2015 and 2016 regular sessions. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
State Constitutional Amendments; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |