HI SB1180 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of geolocation information and internet browser information without consent.
Title
Relating To Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT deferred the measure until 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LBT, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1180 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1180&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1180_.HTM |