HI SB1173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to be used by the department of education for a grant to provide space education programming services at the Barbers Point elementary school for fiscal year 20112012. Requires Challenger Center Hawaii to submit a plan to the legislature to become financially self-sufficient for fiscal year 2012-2013 and thereafter. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Appropriation; Department of Education; Barbers Point Elementary School; Challenger Center Hawaii
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Chang, Hanohano. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-21-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 38 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 265) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from PGM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to PGM/EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |