HI SB1103 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates commission on effective legislation within the office of the ombudsman and chaired by the ombudsman. Sets membership to include representatives from 6 executive departments, to be appointed by the senate president and house speaker; the counties; and University of Hawaii. Requires commission to examine existing laws within the Hawaii Revised Statutes referred by legislators, state and county agencies, and the public that may be obsolete, redundant, conflicting, or ambiguous. Requires ombudsman to report to legislature biennially. (SD1)
Title
Commission on Effective Legislation; Ombudsman
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 302) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Gabbard . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) One Day Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hee. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |