HI SB1086 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1086
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the Hawaii Health Authority.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Health Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-17-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1086 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
HB932 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB932 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1086&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1086_.HTM |