HI SB1083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1083
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives the authority to jointly allocate and assign for occupation non-metered parking stalls and all office space at the state capitol except the fifth floor. Provides the Governor the authority to allocate office space on the fifth floor of the state capitol.
Title
Relating To The State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB352 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1083 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM.
SB1083 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-Referred to GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1083&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1083_.HTM |