HI HB352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB352
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives the authority to jointly allocate and assign for occupation non-metered parking stalls except those reserved for the Office of the Governor and Office of the Lieutenant Governor and all office space at the state capitol except the fifth floor and certain offices of the fourth floor. Provides the Governor the authority to allocate office space on the fifth floor of the state capitol. Takes effect 1/1/2051. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from LCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1510) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:35PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say, Thielen, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Say, Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Belatti, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1083 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB352 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB352 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.