HI SB1048 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1048
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals payroll day for public officers and employees by requiring them to be paid pursuant to a predicted payroll schedule, rather than an after-the-fact payroll schedule.
Title
Relating To Public Employee Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1048 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
HB333 (Same As) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
HB333 (Same As) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1048&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1048_.HTM |