HI SB1048 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to enact zoning ordinances to protect against land slides and rock slides.
Title
Zoning
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to TIA, WTL. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1002 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1048&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1048_.HTM |