HI SB1032 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:20PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:20PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "tobacco products" to include tobacco-free products containing nicotine that are intended for human consumption. Increases the license fee for wholesalers or dealers of cigarettes or tobacco products. Increases the retail tobacco permit fee for retailers engaged in the retail sale of cigarettes and tobacco products. (SB1032 HD2)
Title
Tobacco Regulation; License Fee; Retail Tobacco Permit; Cigarettes; Tobacco Products
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:20PM in conference room 225. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:40pm in conference room 016. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:20AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 at 4:00 pm in conference room 016. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Kahele, Kouchi, Taniguchi. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 563). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Jordan, Kawakami, Keohokalole, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1641) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Jordan; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, Kawakami, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2015-03-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:40PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-25-15. |
2015-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-23-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 265) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Inouye, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 681) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ruderman. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1184 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6