HI HB1184 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "tobacco products". Increases the license fee for persons engaged as a wholesaler or dealer of cigarettes or tobacco products. Increases the retail tobacco permit fee for retailers engaged in the retail sale of cigarettes and other tobacco products. Specifies that revenue from the license and permit fees shall be used to support smoking cessation programs in the State.
Title
Tobacco Regulation; License Fee; Retail Tobacco Permit; Cigarettes; Tobacco Products; Smoking Cessation Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1032 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:20PM in conference room 225.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1184&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1184_.HTM |