HI SB1022 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to repeal the minimum one-year Hawaii residency requirement for appointment as an officer of a principal department pursuant to article V, section 6, of the Constitution of the State of Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Residency Requirement; Appointed Officials (ConAm)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |