HI SB1017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1017
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Erin's law task force to review policies, programs, and curricula for educating public school students about sexual abuse and sex trafficking prevention, report recommendations for the establishment of a program to educate public school children on sexual abuse prevention through age appropriate curricula, provide relevant training to school teachers and staff, and inform parents and guardians about important child sexual abuse topics. Requires the Department of Education to establish and implement a systemwide sexual abuse prevention education program at the conclusion of the task force. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Sexual Violence Prevention Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB386 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1017 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
SB1017 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1017&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1017_.HTM |