HI HR91 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Hawaii Early Head Start To Raise Its Annual Household Income Eligibility Guidelines.
Title
Hawaii Early Head Start; Annual Household Income Eligibility Guidelines
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=91&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR91_.HTM |