HI HR68 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Community Awareness Of Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis, Also Known As Als Or Lou Gehrig's Disease, And Community Support For Finding A Cure For Als And The Provision Of Assistance To Als Patients.
Title
Community Support and Awareness; ALS; Lou Gehrig's Disease; Finding a Cure
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1405-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-31 | House | Re-referred to HLT, referral sheet 47 |
2014-03-28 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 04-02-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR93 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 32