HI HR50 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR50
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Evaluate And Make Recommendation On Facilitating The Re-use Of Water In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Evaluate And Make Recommendation On Facilitating The Re-use Of Water In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HHS/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR50 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=50&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR50_.HTM |