HI HR226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Submit To The Legislature A Report Of Observation Viewing Time On The Telescopes On Mauna Kea.
Title
Mauna Kea; Public Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Belatti, Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Deferred one day 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Tokioka, B. Oshiro, Chong, Evans, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Monday, 04-05-10 3:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee, Mizuno excused. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from HED/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to LMG. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Ito, Har, Cabanilla, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Chong, Luke, Morita. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Chang, Nakashima, Berg, Hanohano, Rhoads, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Bertram, Manahan, Shimabukuro, Yamane. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-22-10 10:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED/WLO on Friday, 03-19-10 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Referred to HED/WLO, LMG, referral sheet 49 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR311 (Same As) 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HRE.