HI HR161 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Mayors And Councils Of The City And County Of Honolulu, County Of Maui, County Of Hawaii, And County Of Kauai To Establish Business Improvement Districts As Special Improvement Districts.
Title
Urging The Mayors And Councils Of The City And County Of Honolulu, County Of Maui, County Of Hawaii, And County Of Kauai To Establish Business Improvement Districts As Special Improvement Districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-03-31 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6). |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-29-23 10:45AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to ECD, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR160 (Same As) 2023-04-21 - Resolution adopted in final form.